Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 513 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6267 Week
» 34225 Month
» 68867 Year
» 1290432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 1982 m/e 06/1903
BR 41982 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Thu 19/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 19/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   19/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as LMS Number 1982
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41982    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41982    

prev prev