Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 377 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18180 Week
» 71196 Month
» 190723 Year
» 3217576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3779 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
British Railways |
43779 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/03/1954 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 27/03/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1903 |
17C |
|
Coalville |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
16C |
|
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/03/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/03/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3779 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Coalville (17C) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43779 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
06/03/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43779 |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|