Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 730 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14773 Week
» 79727 Month
» 282391 Year
» 3309244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3801 |
m/e |
08/1904 |
British Railways |
43801 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 08/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/09/1951 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 20/10/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1904 |
14C |
|
St Albans |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
14C |
|
St Albans |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/09/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14C |
St Albans |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3801 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43801 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43801 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|