Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 145 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17948 Week
» 70964 Month
» 190491 Year
» 3217344 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3814 |
m/e |
01/1907 |
British Railways |
43814 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 01/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/10/1960 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1907 |
19C |
|
Canklow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
41D |
Canklow |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
41D |
Canklow |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1907 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3814 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43814 |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43814 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|