Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 5 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6851 Week
» 18398 Month
» 418080 Year
» 494667 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 29   04/1895
LMS 16231   01/01/1923
BR 56231   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 04/1895
Withdrawal During 02/1956
Scrapping During 03/1956
Service Life 60 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   02/04/1952
WDN   27/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1895 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16231    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56231    
02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 56231    

prev prev