Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 493 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5094 Week
» 16641 Month
» 416323 Year
» 492910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 203   11/1895
LMS 16232   01/01/1923
BR 56232   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1895
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/04/1962
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 66 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 02/07/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 63B   w/e 22/10/1949
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 04/07/1959
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1895 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16232    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56232    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
30/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 56232    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev