Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 15 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6230 Week
» 17935 Month
» 349424 Year
» 426011 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 206   12/1895
LMS 16235   01/01/1923
BR 56235   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 12/1895
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1960
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1895 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16235    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56235    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 56235    

prev prev