Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 229 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 229 Week
» 11776 Month
» 411458 Year
» 488045 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 237   12/1898
LMS 16241   01/01/1923
BR 56241   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal During 01/1960
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28A Motherwell 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/10/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   20/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16241    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56241    
26/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 56241    

prev prev