Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 9 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6855 Week
» 18402 Month
» 418084 Year
» 494671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 239   12/1898
LMS 16243   01/01/1923
BR 56243   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal During 02/1957
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68B Dumfries 8w/e 16/04/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 19/03/1955
WDN   08/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16243    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56243    
16/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 56243    

prev prev