Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 6 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6852 Week
» 18399 Month
» 418081 Year
» 494668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 242   01/1899
LMS 16246   01/01/1923
BR 56246 w/e 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal During 04/1961
Scrapping During 05/1961
Service Life 62 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29A Perth South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   10/04/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16246    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56246    
04/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 56246    

prev prev