Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 13 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6859 Week
» 18406 Month
» 418088 Year
» 494675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 244   01/1899
LMS 16248   01/01/1923
BR 56248   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 01/1899
Withdrawal During 01/1955
Scrapping During 01/1955
Service Life 56 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   07/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16248    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56248    
13/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 56248    

prev prev