Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 221 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 221 Week
» 11768 Month
» 411450 Year
» 488037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 485   02/1899
LMS 16252   01/01/1923
BR 56252   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 02/1899
Withdrawal During 03/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 60 yrs , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A St Rollox (Balornock) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67C Ayr 4w/e 05/07/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 12/07/1958
WDN   27/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16252    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56252    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 56252    

prev prev