Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 169 Today
» 1071 Yesterday
» 169 Week
» 19633 Month
» 419315 Year
» 495902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 794   09/1898
LMS 16266   01/01/1923
BR 56266   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 09/1898
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 61 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   12/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16266    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56266    
13/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 56266    

prev prev