Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 776 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4393 Week
» 16098 Month
» 347587 Year
» 424174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 795   09/1898
LMS 16267   01/01/1923
BR 56267   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 09/1898
Withdrawal During 07/1958
Service Life 59 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A Corkerhill 8w/e 22/12/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   08/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16267    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56267    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 56267    

prev prev