Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 803   10/1898
LMS 16275   01/01/1923
BR 56275   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal During 03/1958
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 21/01/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   26/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16275    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56275    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 56275    

prev prev