Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 806   11/1898
LMS 16278   01/01/1923
BR 56278   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1898
Withdrawal w/e Mon 11/06/1962
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 63 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
66B Motherwell 4w/e 01/07/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 11/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16278    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56278    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
11/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 56278    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev