Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 11 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6857 Week
» 18404 Month
» 418086 Year
» 494673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 807   11/1898
LMS 16279   01/01/1923
BR 56279   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1898
Withdrawal During 11/1960
Scrapping During 11/1960
Service Life 62 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 25/10/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   13/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16279    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56279    
25/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 56279    

prev prev