Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 809   11/1898
LMS 16281   01/01/1923
BR 56281   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1898
Withdrawal During 11/1958
Scrapping During 01/1959
Service Life 60 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28A Motherwell 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63B Stirling 4w/e 16/02/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 63B Stirling 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   13/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16281    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Motherwell (28A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56281    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (63B)    
11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 56281    

prev prev