Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 17 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 17937 Month
» 349426 Year
» 426013 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 810   11/1898
LMS 16282   01/01/1923
BR 56282   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1898
Withdrawal Mon 02/04/1962
Scrapping During 07/1962
Service Life 63 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 02/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   16/05/1958
WDN   w/e 02/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1898 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 16282    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 56282    
02/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 56282    

prev prev