Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1982 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20893 Week
» 85847 Month
» 288511 Year
» 3315364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
682 |
m/e |
02/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
CarR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Hudswell Clarke |
To Service |
During 02/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/10/1953 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1920 |
CED |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/10/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/03/1955 |
The Last Of The Cardiff Railway Saddle-tanks |
Among the locomotives received into Great Western stock from the Cardiff Railway in 1922 were four 0-6-0 saddle-tanks numbered 14, 16, 17 and 32 which were the latest additions to Cardiff Railway stock, having been supplied as recently as 1920 by Messrs. Hudswell Clarke & Co. Ltd. The makers' nos. were 1404/5/7/8, and the G.W.R. Nos. 681-684 in order. Inside cylinders 18' x 24', wheel diameter 4' 1½'. Wheelbase 13' 0' (6' 9' plus 6' 3'). Length over buffers 30' 6'. Heating surface: tubes 982.2 sq. ft., firebox 97.5 sq. ft., total 1079.7 sq. ft. Grate area 17.36 sq. ft. Tank capacity 1250 gallons, coal capacity of bunker 2 tons. The tanks extended from the cab front to the front of the smokebox. The engines were reboilered and fitted with pannier tanks by the G.W.R. They were available for passenger service, using the vacuum brake. During their G.W. ownership they remained on their original section. After well over thirty years' work they were withdrawn on the following dates: 682, 5.10.1953; 684, 28.5.1954; 683, 20.12.1954; and 681 in February 1955. Only one Cardiff Railway engine remains in Western Region stock: 1338 old No. 5, a four-wheeled dock shunter, built in 1898 by Kitson & Co. Ltd. (makers' no. 3799). The sister engine, 1339, was withdrawn in May 1932. Cylinders (outside) 14' x 21', wheels 3' 2i'. The valve gear is a patent of the makers. |
SLS/195505 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 682 Built at Hudswell Clarke |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
05/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 682 |
|
|