|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/08/1947 | Evercreech Junction | The following branch line workings were noted during a visit on 3/8:-Evercreech-Burnham Nos. 1298, 1346, 3218, 3356, and 3464 Bridgwater: No. 3593. | SLS/194709 |
23/10/1948 | Wells and Bridgwater Branches | On 23/10 No. 1425 (22E) worked the Wells branch, and No. 3204 (22D) the Bridgwater branch. Nos. 1298 an 1303 were working between Burnham and Evercreech Junction; No. 3218 (22E) was pilot at the latter place. | SLS/194812 |
28/06/1951 | Derby Works | New class 5MT complete up to 73007, 73008 almost finished. 73009 frames and cylinders, 73010/1 frames only. In works for special examination were 40444, 41005 and (4)1856. Other interesting locos were 43218 (71H), 43787 (8B), 47337 (12E), 22912 (11B), 64808 (39B), 64724 (9G), 64750 (38A). | SLS/195108 |
14/07/1951 | Derby Works | During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. | SLS/195109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1902 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3218 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Highbridge (22E) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43218 | ||
29/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (22D) | ||
25/04/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43218 | ||
07/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |