Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2275 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20078 Week
» 73094 Month
» 192621 Year
» 3219474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3234 |
y/e |
1890 |
British Railways |
43234 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1890 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 04/02/1961 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 25/02/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1890 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3234 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43234 |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43234 |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|