Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 897 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14303 Week
» 67319 Month
» 186846 Year
» 3213699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3242 |
y/e |
1890 |
British Railways |
43242 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1890 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/08/1962 |
Service Life |
72 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Tue 09/10/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1890 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3242 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43242 |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43242 |
|
|
09/10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|