|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Works Shunter) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1891 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3261 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43261 | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (15D) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (15D) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
10/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bedford (14E) | ||
24/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43261 | ||
23/01/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |