Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3277 |
y/e |
1891 |
British Railways |
43277 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/07/1961 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1891 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3277 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) (21D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43277 |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
22/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43277 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|