Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16001 Week
» 69017 Month
» 188544 Year
» 3215397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3330 |
m/e |
04/1892 |
British Railways |
43330 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 04/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/08/1961 |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/02/1959 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. |
SLS/195904 |
21/03/1959 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
The Midland 3Fs (43330/89/94) are expected to go into store shortly-J10 65158 replaced 43394 for a short period but has gone back into store. 9Fs are now appearing regularly from Newport and Cardiff. |
SLS/195905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3330 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43330 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43330 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|