Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2419 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15825 Week
» 68841 Month
» 188368 Year
» 3215221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3378 |
y/e |
1892 |
British Railways |
43378 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/12/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1892 |
16A |
|
Nottingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
6K |
|
Rhyl |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
6K |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
6K |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1892 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3378 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43378 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43378 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|