Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18240 Week
» 71256 Month
» 190783 Year
» 3217636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3440 |
y/e |
1893 |
British Railways |
43440 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1893 |
14A |
|
Cricklewood East |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
14E |
|
Bedford |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14E |
Bedford |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1893 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3440 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43440 |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43440 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|