|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/08/1947 | Evercreech Junction | The following branch line workings were noted during a visit on 3/8:-Evercreech-Burnham Nos. 1298, 1346, 3218, 3356, and 3464 Bridgwater: No. 3593. | SLS/194709 |
06/04/1962 | Derby Works (Works Sidings) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1894 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3464 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43464 | ||
09/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) | ||
27/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43464 | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |