Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1410 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14816 Week
» 67832 Month
» 187359 Year
» 3214212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3565 |
y/e |
1897 |
British Railways |
43565 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During y/e 1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/06/1962 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Tue 30/10/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14C |
St Albans |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
14E |
Bedford |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1897 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3565 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43565 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43565 |
|
|
30/10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|