Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3788 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17194 Week
» 70210 Month
» 189737 Year
» 3216590 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3578 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
British Railways |
43578 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/02/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1899 |
17A |
|
Derby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3578 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43578 |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43578 |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|