Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20329 Week
» 85283 Month
» 287947 Year
» 3314800 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3579 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
British Railways |
43579 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Kitson |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/12/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Thu 22/12/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/07/1950 |
Derby Works |
Engines into works: 40410, 413, 40929, 41088, 41752, 41902, 3574. 3579, 44127, 44242, 44262, 44277, 44575, 47301, 47426, 47513, 12011, 58229, 64752, 64906. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3579 Built at Kitson |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourton (20B) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43579 |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43579 |
|
|
22/12/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|