19/09/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. |
SLS/196110 |
24/03/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (Foundry Siding) |
Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. |
SLS/196304 |
15/05/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Siding) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. |
SLS/196304 |
16/06/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196307 |
12/07/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. |
SLS/196308 |
15/08/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41535, 75011/042/050, D2504, D2508, D2911, D3024/54/249/91; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D13, D69, D5015/28/81, D49, D72, D80/1, D91, D131/41/54/5, D5030/5. Test House: D7, D14, D47, D133/4/9; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5233-7, D7568-77 new. Diesel Shop: D6, D11, D37, D58, D90/2, D105, D5010/92/221. Paint Shop: 75012, D5220. Finishing Shop: D67/8, D79, D5008, D5204/22. Stone Pit: 44433, 48105. Foundry Row: 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 63658, 73067/090. Yard: D2, D3, D43, D59, D93, D114/5/20/49, D2221, D2902/7, D5027/76/82, D5395, ED4, ED7. As Derby is expected to cease steam repairs shortly, several engines have been sent to Crewe for repair/scrap. |
SLS/196309 |