|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Belle Vue MPD | The following interesting visitors were noted during January: 2829 (21A); 3319 (16B); 3982 (15A); 3615 (4A); 4853 (20A), 5298 (8A); 12861 (23B). During February: 3231 (20G); 3335 (20G); 3454 (15D); 3620 (21A); 3859 (16B); 4045 (22B); 4186 (21A); 4292 (11E). On 9/2 6132 (20A) passed through on an express travelling in the direction of Manchester Victoria. | SLS/194604 |
14/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 14/10/50:-40585 27A, 40910 9E, 41057 17A, 41060 17A, 41080 20E, 1846 16A, 42301 11D, 42414 25B, 3058 (58204) 19C, 3274 9D, 43615 8B, 43885 18B, 43911 21A, 44408 16A, 44599 17B, 45594 19B. New Construction: 12077 in Paint Shop and 12078-80 complete on 9/10; 42052 on trials 29/9 and 42053 9/10; 42054/5 complete, 42056 almost complete and frames for next two down, 9/10; frames for the next diesel (d12081) are also laid down. Ex Works: 41062, 41154, 43914, 44598, 64980, 58209, 64962, 40351, 41068, 41006, 47548, 42353, 43456, 47481. No. 10800 was on test run on 29/9, and 10800 was standing outside the diesel shop on 9/10. | SLS/195012 |
03/06/1961 | Warrington Arpley | Arpley sub-shed is actually responsible for the motor-workings on the Ditton Junc.-Widnes -Oxford Road services and its allocation is 41210/1/86/8-also stabled there are 43282, 43615 an 47406. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
1899 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3615 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 43615 | ||
23/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
17/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43615 | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |