Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1224 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14630 Week
» 67646 Month
» 187173 Year
» 3214026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3624 |
y/e |
1899 |
British Railways |
43624 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1899 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 13/05/1961 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
15B |
Kettering |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
9G |
Gorton |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/05/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1899 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3624 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43624 |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
13/05/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43624 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|