Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4262 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17668 Week
» 70684 Month
» 190211 Year
» 3217064 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3644 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43644 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/10/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 09/11/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1900 |
21A |
|
Saltley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/10/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/12/1960 |
Gorton Works (Works Sidings) |
Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3644 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43644 |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43644 |
|
|
09/11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|