Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1899 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15305 Week
» 68321 Month
» 187848 Year
» 3214701 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3651 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43651 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/07/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
13/08/1950 |
Inter regional allocations |
The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). |
SLS/195012 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3651 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43651 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43651 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|