Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3652 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43652 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/08/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 12/11/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3652 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43652 |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43652 |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|