Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3316 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16722 Week
» 69738 Month
» 189265 Year
» 3216118 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3667 |
y/e |
1900 |
British Railways |
43667 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During y/e 1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/04/1954 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 17/04/1954 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1900 |
21A |
|
Saltley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
21C |
|
Bromsgrove |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
03/04/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21C |
Bromsgrove |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/04/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1900 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3667 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43667 |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (21C) |
|
|
03/04/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43667 |
|
|
17/04/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|