Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 387 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 1259 Week
» 13037 Month
» 302429 Year
» 813531 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D120 30/09/1961
TOPS (Tops) 45108 06/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 30/09/1961
Withdrawn 04/08/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 30/09/1961
14B Cricklewood West w/e 07/11/1964
ML Line Power Controller, Derby 16/01/1965
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 18/05/1968
   Withdrawn 04/08/1987


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1961 To Service To service as D120
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 45108    
04/08/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 45108    

prev prev