Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4493 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20105 Week
» 118750 Month
» 321414 Year
» 3348267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Works Num) |
D0280 |
13/10/1961 |
|
Pre TOPS |
D1200 |
19/12/1970 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
FALCON |
13/10/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
19/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/12/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
11/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/10/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
19/12/1970 |
ao |
Air brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1972 |
ao |
Air brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D0280, name: FALCON Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 280 Allocated to Manufacturer (Manufacturer) |
|
|
11/1961 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
03/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
04/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1200 |
|
|
08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
17/06/1974 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
30/06/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
05/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1200 |
|
|
02/04/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|