Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2779 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16185 Week
» 69201 Month
» 188728 Year
» 3215581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3742 |
y/e |
1902 |
British Railways |
43742 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1902 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/08/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/08/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1902 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3742 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43742 |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
24/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
05/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43742 |
|
|
07/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|