Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
  7076 30/09/1936
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12001 03/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/6
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/09/1936
Withdrawn 03/02/1962
Time in Service 25 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1962
Cut At Locomotive Works (Horwich)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 03/02/1962


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1936 To Service To service as 12001
Built at Derby Works
   
30/09/1936 To Service To service as 7076
Built at Derby Works
   
03/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 12001    
03/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7076    
01/04/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich    
15/04/1962 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link

prev prev