Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1228 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19031 Week
» 72047 Month
» 191574 Year
» 3218427 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3753 |
y/e |
1902 |
British Railways |
43753 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1902 |
15C |
|
Leicester Midland |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
41D |
|
Canklow |
4w/e |
08/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41D |
Canklow |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1902 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3753 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43753 |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43753 |
|
|
07/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|