Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 414 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24045 Week
» 88999 Month
» 291663 Year
» 3318516 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
LMS |
7079 |
30/04/1934 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12002 |
24/09/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/6 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
30/04/1934 |
Withdrawn |
16/06/1956 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 09/1956 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Horwich) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
30/04/1934 |
5B |
|
Crewe South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/06/1956 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/04/1934 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7079 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12002 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12002 |
|
|
09/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Horwich |
|
|