Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1251 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20162 Week
» 85116 Month
» 287780 Year
» 3314633 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3767 |
m/e |
02/1903 |
British Railways |
43767 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/10/1953 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 10/10/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21D |
Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3767 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) (21D) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43767 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43767 |
|
|
10/10/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|