Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 169 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17972 Week
» 70988 Month
» 190515 Year
» 3217368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7082 |
27/05/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12005 |
27/08/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,429.00 |
To Service |
27/05/1939 |
Withdrawn |
09/09/1967 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
04/1968 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/05/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/05/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7082 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
05/05/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12005 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12005 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|