Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19323 Week
» 72339 Month
» 191866 Year
» 3218719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7085 |
11/09/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12008 |
09/07/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
11/09/1939 |
Withdrawn |
15/07/1967 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
02/1968 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
11/09/1939 |
18A |
|
Toton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/07/1967 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/09/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7085 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12008 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12008 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|