Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 229 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 229 Week
» 11776 Month
» 411458 Year
» 488045 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 814   05/1899
LMS 17552   01/01/1923
BR 57552   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 05/1899
Withdrawal During 12/1959
Scrapping During 02/1961
Service Life 60 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27B Greenock Ladyburn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   18/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17552    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57552    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 57552    
10/03/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.   Link
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev