Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 231 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 231 Week
» 11778 Month
» 411460 Year
» 488047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 815   06/1899
LMS 17553   01/01/1923
BR 57553   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 06/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 60 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28B Dalry Road 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/12/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/12/1952
WDN   23/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17553    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dalry Road (28B)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57553    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 57553    

prev prev